EP2070508 - Skin-care composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/19] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Johnson and Johnson GmbH Kaiserwerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crotogino, Johannes Dorotheenstrasse 51 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Lange, Rainer Weinsbergstrasse 112 50823 Köln / DE | 03 /
Rosato, Pietro Adalbertstrasse 8 51379 Leverkusen / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/34] |
Former [2009/25] | Metten, Karl-Heinz Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024339.9 | 14.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070508 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070508 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/37, A61K8/39, A61K8/60, A61K8/81, A61K8/85, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/85 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/005 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hautpflegezusammensetzung | [2009/25] | English: | Skin-care composition | [2009/25] | French: | Composition de soin dermatologique | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2007 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IE | 14.12.2018 | LU | 14.12.2018 | MT | 14.12.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.12.2007 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9630576 (KIMBERLY CLARK TISSUE CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,10 * * example 3 * * page 8, lines 29-35 *; | [X]US5869075 (KRZYSIK DUANE GERARD [US]) [X] 18-31 * example 11 *; | [X]DE19805433 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 18-31 * examples A-C; table 2 *; | [X]DE19906081 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 18-31 * claim 2 * * examples 1-5 *; | [X]WO02056841 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-31 * examples 1-6,V1 *; | [X]WO02056842 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 18-31 * examples 1-5,V2 *; | [XD]WO02072052 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-17 * claims 1,2,11-16 * * examples 5,6 * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 23 *; | [X]WO03037292 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 18-31 * example 10; table 4b *; | [X]WO03039492 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 18-31 * claims 1,4 * * examples A.1,A.3,A.5,A.6,A.8,A.9 * * examples B.1,B.3,B.5,B.5,B.8 *; | [X]WO03066073 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * example 1 *; | [X]WO2004062630 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 18-31 * pages 24-25 ** examples 2,3 *; | [X]US2005008681 (DECKNER GEORGE ENDEL [US], et al) [X] 18-31 * claims 1,6 * * paragraph [0013] *; | [X]WO2005004834 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-5 *; | [X]US2005136098 (SPADINI ALESSANDRO L [US], et al) [X] 18-31 * example 1; table 1 *; | [X]WO2006000360 (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 18-31 * claims 6,8 * * table 1 * * page 10, lines 1-15 *; | [X]WO2006083980 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples A-E *; | [X]WO2006099232 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * example 1 *; | [X]US2006233866 (HAUSER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 18-31 * examples 2,3,13,14 *; | [X]US2007026028 (CLOSE KENNETH B [US], et al) [X] 18-31 * examples 1,4,5 *; | [X]EP1757261 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON GMBH [DE]) [X] 18-31 * examples 1-F,1-G,1-H,1-I,1-M,1-N,2-M * | by applicant | WO9630576 | WO02056841 | WO03066073 | WO2005004834 | WO2006083980 |