EP1942646 - Multimedia conferencing method and signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states AVAYA TECHNOLOGY LLC 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920-2332 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyer, David G. 77 Cayuga Avenue 07757 Oceanport, New Jersey / US | 02 /
Moore, Sean Samuel Butler 20 Mendelssohn Drive 03049 Hollis, New Hampshire / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Hafner-Tergau-Walkenhorst Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024489.2 | 18.12.2007 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | US20070650698 | 08.01.2007 Original published format: US 650698 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1942646 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1942646 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/56, H04L12/18, H04L29/06 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
H04M3/56 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/18 (KR);
H04L12/1818 (EP,US);
H04L65/403 (EP,US);
H04M3/566 (EP,US);
H04M3/568 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | H04M3/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2011/20] |
Former [2011/13] | |||
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Multimediakonferenzverfahren und -signal | [2008/28] | English: | Multimedia conferencing method and signal | [2008/28] | French: | Procédé de conférence multimédia et signal | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 21.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 12.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2010 | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0650285 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-36 * abstract ** column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 17 * |