EP1916011 - An electrical lead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cathrx Ltd 5 Parkview Drive Homebush Bay, NSW 2127 / AU | [2009/23] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states CathRx Ltd National Innovation Centre Australian Technology Park Eveleigh NSW 1430 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Neil Lawrence 95 Macquarie Street Roseville, NSW 2009 / AU | 02 /
Chong, Evan Ka-Loke 21 James Street South Strathfield, NSW 2136 / AU | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Straße 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Brady, Paul Andrew, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07024785.3 | 19.10.2001 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | AU2000PR00903 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: AU PR090300 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1916011 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916011 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04, H01B1/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61B5/25 (EP,US);
A61B2562/125 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49224 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1338 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Leiter | [2008/18] | English: | An electrical lead | [2008/18] | French: | Fil électrique | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2012 | 20.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01977995.8 / EP1333881 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010977995) is 01.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | IE | 19.10.2013 | LU | 19.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 05.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4101984 (MACGREGOR DAVID C) [Y] 5,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 44 - line 56 * * column 8, line 15 - line 20 *; | [X]WO9008466 (GORE & ASS [US]) [X] 1,6-8,17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0479435 (VENTRITEX INC [US]) [Y] 15,16 * abstract * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 53 *; | [X]US5269810 (HULL JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5522874 (GATES JAMES T [US]) [A] 17-22* the whole document *; | [X]WO9636860 (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,13,14 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 25 * * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 19 *; | [X]US5931862 (CARSON DEAN F [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,13,14,17-22 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6071278 (PANESCU DORIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14,17-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 55 * * column 5, line 15 - column 30, line 64 * [Y] 5,9,15,16 | by applicant | US5279781 | US5609622 |