EP1933150 - Screening for peptides inhibiting PP1c binding to BcI-2, BCL-XL and BCL-W proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/25] | Methods of screening of PP1-interacting polypeptides or proteins, peptides inhibiting PP1c binding to Bcl-2 proteins, BCL-XL and BCL-W, and uses thereof | ||
[2008/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Alphonse Villa du Théâtre 37 rue Molière 792120 Montrouge / FR | 02 /
Cayla, Xavier 11 rue Raphaël L. Pouan 37210 Rochecorbon / FR | 03 /
Rebollo, Angelita 21, square Jean Thébaud 75015 Paris / FR | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
Garcia, Alphonse Villa du Théâtre 37 rue Molière 792120 Montrouge / FR | ||
02 /
Cayla, Xavier 11 rue Raphaël L. Pouan 37210 Rochecorbon / FR | |||
03 /
Rebollo, Angelita 21, square Jean Thébaud 75015 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/25] | Desaix, Anne Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07025179.8 | 06.05.2003 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | EP20020291170 | 07.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02291170 | [2008/25] | Previously filed application, date | EP20030749894 | 06.05.2003 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933150 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933150 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K16/44, G01N33/50, C12N15/11, A61K48/00 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C40B30/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/505 (EP,US);
G01N33/6842 (EP,US);
G01N33/6845 (EP,US);
G01N2333/916 (EP,US);
G01N2500/02 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | Screeningverfahren für Peptide, die die Bindung von PP1c an die Proteine Bcl-2, BCL-XL und BCL-W hemmen | [2008/26] | English: | Screening for peptides inhibiting PP1c binding to BcI-2, BCL-XL and BCL-W proteins | [2008/26] | French: | Procédés d'analyse, de peptides inhibiteurs de la liaison de PP1c avec des protéines Bcl-2, BCL-XL et BCL-W | [2008/26] |
Former [2008/25] | Screeningverfahren für PP1-wechselwirkende Polypeptide oder Proteine, Peptide, die die Bindung von PP1c an die Proteine Bcl-2, BCL-XL und BCL-W hemmen, und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [2008/25] | Methods of screening of PP1-interacting polypeptides or proteins, peptides inhibiting PP1c binding to Bcl-2 proteins, BCL-XL and BCL-W, and uses thereof | ||
Former [2008/25] | Procédés d'analyse de polypeptides ou de protéines interagissant avec PP1, de peptides inhibiteurs de la liaison de PP1c avec des protéines Bcl-2, BCL-XL et BCL-W, et utilisations de ceux-ci | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03749894.6 / EP1502116 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | HU | 23.06.2010 | IT | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | ES | 04.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
HU | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - AYLLÓN V ET AL, "Bcl-2 targets protein phosphatase 1 alpha to Bad.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.: 1950) UNITED STATES 15 JUN 2001, (20010615), vol. 166, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 7345 - 7352, XP002218405 [DA] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - FERNANDEZ JOSE A ET AL, "Analysis of protein S C4b-binding protein interactions by homology modeling and inhibitory antibodies.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 37, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 11073 - 11078, XP002218407 [A] 1-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00203a003 | [A] - FUKUDA M N ET AL, "A peptide mimic of E-selectin ligand inhibits sialyl Lewis X-dependent lung colonization of tumor cells", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20000115), vol. 60, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 450 - 456, XP002210449 [A] 1-18 * abstract * | [T] - AYLLON VERONICA ET AL, "The anti-apoptotic molecules Bcl-xL and Bcl-w target protein phosphatase 1alpha to Bad.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20020613), vol. 32, no. 7, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 1847 - 1855, XP002218406 [T] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200207)32:7<1847::AID-IMMU1847>3.0.CO;2-7 | by applicant | EP0171496 | EP0184187 | WO8702671 | US4946778 | US4980286 | WO9308829 | US5258498 | - MERRIFIELD, ADV. ENZMOL. RELATED AREAS MOL. BIOL., (1969), vol. 32, pages 221 - 96 | - MERRFIELD, RECENT PROG. HORM. RES, (1967), vol. 23, pages 451 - 82 | - GOLDSPIEL ET AL., CLIN. PHARM., (1993), vol. 12, pages 488 - 505 | - ROBBINS ET AL, PHARMACOL. THER., (1998), vol. 80, no. 1, pages 35 - 47 | - MILLER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 217, pages 581 - 599 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE, Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - JESPERS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - HUSTON ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88 | - SHU ET AL., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7995 - 7999 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1040 | - MILSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | WO1990US02545 |