EP1939966 - Method for operating a fuel cell system assigned to an air conditioning system and air conditioning for independent air conditioning of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Kraillinger Str. 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfalzgraf, Manfred Schmidschneiderstrasse 22b 82211 Herrsching am Ammersee / DE | 02 /
Bedenbecker, Markus Feldstrasse 22 82131 Gauting / DE | 03 /
Boltze, Matthias Asternstrasse 5 17039 Wulkenzin (OT Neuendorf) / DE | 04 /
Engl, Andreas Willbaldstrasse 117 80689 München / DE | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07033538.5 | 30.10.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | DE20061056358 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056358 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939966 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H01M8/04089 (EP);
B60H1/00428 (EP);
H01M16/006 (EP);
H01M8/04186 (EP);
B60H2001/2284 (EP);
H01M2250/20 (EP);
H01M8/04014 (EP);
H01M8/04022 (EP);
H01M8/0618 (EP);
H01M8/0662 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/11] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern eines einer Klimaanlage zugeordneten Brennstoffzellensystems und Klimaanlage zur Standklimatisierung eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2008/27] | English: | Method for operating a fuel cell system assigned to an air conditioning system and air conditioning for independent air conditioning of a motor vehicle | [2008/27] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un système de cellules combustibles attribué à une climatisation et climatisation destinée à la climatisation d'un véhicule automobile | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6121628 (RISING BRUCE W [US]) [A] 1-5,8-14,17,18 * abstract *; | [A]DE19927518 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [X]WO0200472 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10,15,16 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 9; figure 1 * * page 4, lines 17-24 * * page 4, line 28 - line 32 *; | [A]EP1205993 (SULZER HEXIS AG [CH]) [A] 1-5,8-14,17,18 * abstract *; | [A]EP1231665 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-5,8-14,17,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0022] *; | [DA]DE10223949 (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,10 * the whole document * |