EP1870264 - A method of attaching a damper to a yoke [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BWI Company Limited S.A. 1, rue des Glacis 1628 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/52] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaffanke, Sebastian UL. 29-GO Listopada 28/9 32-050 Skawina / PL | 02 /
Skrent, Bartosz UL. Basztowa 42/4 58-300 Walbrzych / PL | 03 /
Wierzbicki, Robert M. UL. Filarecka 13/1 30-110 Krakow / PL | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/52] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07075468.4 | 13.06.2007 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | GB20060012375 | 22.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0612375 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870264 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870264 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60G13/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B60G13/005 (EP);
B60G2200/144 (EP);
B60G2204/43 (EP);
B60G2206/41 (EP);
B60G2206/50 (EP);
B60G2206/8104 (EP);
B60G2206/82092 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befestigen eines Dämpfers an einem Gabelstück | [2007/52] | English: | A method of attaching a damper to a yoke | [2007/52] | French: | Procédé de fixation d'un amortisseur sur une fourche | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 10.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2007 | AT | 29.02.2012 | BE | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | IE | 13.06.2012 | LU | 13.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2023/46] |
Former [2017/31] | HU | 13.06.2007 | |
AT | 29.02.2012 | ||
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LU | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 13.06.2007 | |
AT | 29.02.2012 | ||
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LU | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LU | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
BE | 29.02.2012 | ||
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1145942 (ARMSTRONG PATENTS CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1429225 (ARMSTRONG PATENTS CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1462771 (ARMSTRONG PATENTS CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2050968 (IAO INDUSTRIE RIUNITE SPA) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB2093157 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3213657 (IAO INDUSTRIE RIUNITE SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10206032 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |