EP1860518 - Pedal assembly and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | [2012/36] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 South Limerick Road Limerick, PA 19468-1699 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peniston, Chuck 4557 Sterner Mill Road Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | 02 /
Vondras, Jan 2803 Stanbridge Street, Timberlake Apts. B703 East Norriton, PA 19401 / US | 03 /
Rick, Sean 3326 Fairland Drive Schnecksvill, PA 18078 / US | 04 /
Doucet, William 69 Gristmill Lane Royersford, PA 19468 / US | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07075693.7 | 18.01.2006 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | US20050644884P | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 644884 P | US20050686642P | 02.06.2005 Original published format: US 686642 P | US20050693845P | 24.06.2005 Original published format: US 693845 P | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860518 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860518 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/14 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
G05G1/38 (EP,US);
B60K26/021 (EP,US);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G05G5/03 (EP,US);
G05G5/04 (EP,US);
F02D41/00 (EP,US);
F02D41/021 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20528 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20534 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2011/19] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pedalanordnung und -verfahren | [2007/48] | English: | Pedal assembly and method | [2007/48] | French: | Assemblage de pédale et procédé | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06718454.9 / EP1875157 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0961100 (KEARNEY NATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,12 * figures 1A,1B * [Y] 4 [I] 3,5-8,10,11; | [Y]WO03095938 (KEANE PADRAIG [IE]) [Y] 4* figures 1-4 * |