EP1903639 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morello, John R. 374 Westchester Dr., SE Warren, OH 44484 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/13] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07075791.9 | 11.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | US20060523358 | 19.09.2006 Original published format: US 523358 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903639 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903639 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903639 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/436, H01R13/422 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H01R13/4362 (EP,US);
H01R13/04 (KR);
H01R13/4223 (EP,US);
H01R13/424 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Steckverbinder | [2008/13] | English: | Electrical connector | [2008/13] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | MT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | PL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | ES | 03.04.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | IE | 11.09.2010 | LU | 11.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
IE | 11.09.2010 | ||
LU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
IE | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 11.09.2010 | ||
IT | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4113333 (HOROWITZ CHARLES) [A] 1,5,9 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 17 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2219445 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7,9,11 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 1 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 33 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US5468162 (ODA KENZO [JP]) [A] 1,5,9 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5980318 (MORELLO JOHN RAYMOND [US], et al) [AD] 1,5,9* the whole document * |