EP1905317 - Method and device for warming and hardening filter rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sönke Horn llenweg 54 D-21502 Geesthacht / DE | 02 /
Stephan Wolff Eichloh 3 D-21509 Glinde / DE | 03 /
Thorsten Scherbarth Westerkamp 43 D-21502 Geesthacht / DE | 04 /
Alexander Buhl Hausnumer 21 D-23974 Blowatz OT Robertsdorf / DE | 05 /
Irene Maurer Sophie-Schoop-Weg 12 D-21035 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
Jann De Boer Clemens-Schultz-Str.76 D-20359 Hamburg / DE | 07 /
Maik Böttcher Hauptstrasse 6 D-21483 Krukow / DE | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Stasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/14] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 73 04 66 22124 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07075851.1 | 27.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | DE20061047098 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006047098 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905317 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905317 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/35, A24D3/00 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
A24D3/025 (EP);
A24C5/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erwärmen und Aushärten von Filterstäben | [2008/14] | English: | Method and device for warming and hardening filter rods | [2008/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de chauffage et de durcissement de tiges de filtre | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | IE | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | MT | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | LU | 27.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | FR | 25.10.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | HU | 26.02.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
LU | 27.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 25.10.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
HU | 26.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 25.10.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
HU | 26.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 25.10.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 27.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 25.08.2010 | |
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0332368 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]) [A] 1-39* the whole document *; | [A]EP1354522 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004235631 (BUHL ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] 1-39 * the whole document * |