EP2048155 - Method and means for the production of pharmaceutically active natural products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humboldt-Universität zu Berlin Unter den Linden 6 10099 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Humboldt-Universität zu Berlin Unter den Linden 6 D-10099 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dittmann, Elke, Prof.Dr. Hufelandstrasse 32 10407 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Ziemert, Nadine Güstrower Strasse 12 12621 Berlin / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Maikowski, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Maikowski, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07075864.4 | 02.10.2007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048155 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K11/00, C07K14/195, C12N15/31, C12N9/10, C12P21/04, // C12N1/15, C12N1/21 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
C12N9/10 (EP);
C07K11/00 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Mittel zur Herstellung pharmazeutisch aktiver natürlicher Produkte | [2009/16] | English: | Method and means for the production of pharmaceutically active natural products | [2009/16] | French: | Procédé et supports pour la production de produits naturels actifs de manière pharmaceutique | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0581429 (TAKARA SHUZO CO [JP]) [A] 14 * abstract *; | [A] - OKINO ET AL, "New microviridins, elastase inhibitors from the blue-green alga Microcystis aeruginosa", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950925), vol. 51, no. 39, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 10679 - 10686, XP005498631 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(95)00645-O | [A] - RESHEF ET AL, "New microviridins from a water bloom of the cyanobacterium Microcystis aeruginosa", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060731), vol. 62, no. 31, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 7361 - 7369, XP005514179 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2006.05.028 | [A] - HEE J S ET AL, "Microviridins D-F,<1> Serine Protease Inhibitors from the Cyanobacterium Oscillatoria agardhii (NIES-204)", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960610), vol. 52, no. 24, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 8159 - 8168, XP004103865 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(96)00377-8 | [PX] - "Microcystis aeruginosa PCC 7806 genome sequencing data, contig C315", EMBL, (20071101), Database accession no. AM778945, URL: EBI, XP002473530 [PX] 1-3,7-13 * relevant parts of sequence entry is given * | [PX] - "Microcystis aeruginosa NIES-843 DNA, complete genome.", EMBL, (20080125), Database accession no. AP009552, URL: EBI, XP002473531 [PX] 1-3,7-13 * relevant parts of sequence entry is given * |