EP1911477 - Automatic self-testing of an implantable medical device with transcutaneous energy transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/16] | Automatic self-testing of an internal device in a closed system | ||
[2008/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codman Neuro Sciences Sarl Chemin-Blanc 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2010/15] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Codman Neuro Sciences Sarl Chemin-Blank 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gringgen, Alec Mail 18 2000 Neuchatel / CH | 02 /
Crivelli, Rocco Viale Giuseppe Motta 32A 6500 Bellinzona / CH | [2009/32] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
Gringgen, Alec Mail 18 2000 Neuchatel / CH | ||
02 /
Crivelli, Rocco Via le Giuseppe Motta 32A 6500 Bellinzona / CH | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07076050.9 | 28.10.2005 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | US20040978247 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: US 978247 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1911477 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1911477 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911477 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61N1/36, A61N1/39 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
A61N1/36142 (EP,US);
A61N1/37217 (EP,US);
A61N1/37276 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/702 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8212 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8243 (EP,US);
A61N1/37241 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Automatischer Selbsttest eines implantierbaren medizinischen Geräts mit transkutaner Energieübertragung | [2008/17] | English: | Automatic self-testing of an implantable medical device with transcutaneous energy transfer | [2008/17] | French: | Test automatique d'auto-vérification d'un dispositif médical implantable avec transmission d'énergie transcutanée | [2009/29] |
Former [2008/16] | Automatischer Selbsttest eines internen Gerätes in einem geschlossenen System | ||
Former [2008/16] | Automatic self-testing of an internal device in a closed system | ||
Former [2008/16] | Test automatique d'un dispositif interne dans un système fermé | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05256693.2 / EP1652542 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | LT | 14.04.2010 | LV | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | IS | 14.08.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | IE | 28.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/42] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5899926 (OCHS DENNIS E [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 4, lines 42-53 *; | [A]US6048328 (HALLER MARCUS [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 10 * * column 7, lines 7-30 *; | [A]US6329822 (POWERS DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 11, lines 37-56 *; | [XA]US2002016568 (LEBEL RONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0390] , [0391]; figure 3 * [A] 2,3,9,10; | [A]US2002087113 (HARTLAUB JEROME T [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] * | by applicant | US2002016568 |