EP1903507 - RFID system for communicating with vehicle on-board computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83706-9632 / US | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuttle, John R. 5514 W. Lake River Lane Boise ID 83703 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Seerden, Adrianus Maria Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Seerden, Adrianus Maria Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07076054.1 | 05.12.1997 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | US19960759737 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: US 759737 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903507 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903507 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00, G08G1/017 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
G08G1/017 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
G07C5/008 (EP,US);
G07C5/085 (EP,US);
G08G1/095 (EP,US);
G08G1/0962 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/13] | Title | German: | RFID-System zur Kommunikation mit einem bordeigenen Fahrzeugcomputer | [2008/13] | English: | RFID system for communicating with vehicle on-board computer | [2008/13] | French: | Système RFID pour la communication avec un ordinateur de bord d'un véhicule | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 24.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | 10.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2010 | 01.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04076203.1 / EP1445749 | EP06076460.2 / EP1713046 | EP97950859.5 / EP0941532 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9012365 (AUTO I D INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-7,9,11-17; | [Y]US5335540 (BOWLER PAUL R [CA], et al) [Y] 2,6,11,16 * abstract * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 2; figure 5 *; | [AY]WO9501607 (TSAKANIKAS PETER JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 7, line 13 - page 10, line 19; figure 4 *[Y] 5,7,9,14,15,17; | [AY]EP0725377 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 12 - line 17 * * column 2, line 26 - line 29 * * column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 58; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 26 - line 36 * [Y] 3,4,9,12,13,17 | by applicant | US4168679 | US4237830 | US4335695 | US4524745 | US4552116 | US4602127 | DE3540599 | US4706082 | US4719458 | US4739323 | US4739324 | US4742349 | US4853850 | US4875391 | US5150690 | US5189612 | US5278759 | US5459660 | US6130602 |