EP1839617 - Screw implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomed Est. Austrasse 49 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ihde, Dr. Stefan Lindenstr. 68 8738 Uetliburg / CH | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Riebling, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2011/29] | Neumann, Günter, et al Hübner - Neumann - Radwer - Wenzel Rechts- und Patentanwaltskanzlei Hegelplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Neumann, Günter, et al Hübner - Neumann - Radwer - Wenzel Frankfurter Allee 286 10317 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Radwer, Dieter, et al Hübner - Neumann - Radwer, Rechtsanwalt und Patentanwälte, Frankfurter Allee 286 10317 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07090060.0 | 27.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | DE20062005321U | 28.03.2006 Original published format: DE 202006005321 U | DE20062008702U | 24.05.2006 Original published format: DE 202006008702 U | DE20062010202U | 27.06.2006 Original published format: DE 202006010202 U | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839617 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
A61C8/0018 (EP);
A61C8/0075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Schraubimplantat | [2007/40] | English: | Screw implant | [2007/40] | French: | Implant à filetage | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2016631 (WEISSMAN B) [X] 1-23 * page 4, lines 19-24,55-61 * * figures 1,2,4,5,17 *; | [X]FR2721819 (AMP DEV [FR], et al) [X] 1-23 * claims 1,2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0112096 (NOBEL BIOCARE USA INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 8, lines 9-17 ** figure 2A *; | [X]DE20202424U (IHDE DENTAL AG UETLIBURG DR [CH]) [X] 1 * page 10, lines 13-16 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO0240073 (UNIV GENEVE [CH], et al) [A] 13-20 * page 5, lines 26-32 * * page 6, lines 15,-20 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 17 * * claims 5,6 *; | [A]EP1358859 (MILANO POLITECNICO [IT]) [A] 22,23 * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]WO2005000146 (SCHROEDER RALF [DE]) [A] 1-23 * page 18, lines 18-22 *; | [A]EP1508311 (HIROSHIMA UNIVERSITY GRADUATE [JP], et al) [A] 21 * paragraphs [0028] , [0071] , [0090] * | by applicant | US4645435 | DE4127839 | DE19628464 | DE19630034 | DE3918309 | DE20306008U | EP1468658 |