EP1816325 - Exhaust pipe joint with insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tru-Flex Metal Hose Corp. 2391 State Road 263 West Lebanon, IN 47991 / US | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swank, Scott 705 East 125 South Williamsport IN 47993 / US | [2010/12] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
Swank, Scott 705 East 125 South Williamsport, IN 47993 / US | Representative(s) | Brandon, Paul Laurence Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Brandon, Paul Laurence APPLEYARD LEES 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07100181.2 | 05.01.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | US20060345458 | 01.02.2006 Original published format: US 345458 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816325 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816325 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/18, F16L21/06 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
F16L21/065 (EP,US);
F01N13/1816 (EP,US);
F01N13/1827 (EP,US);
F01N13/1844 (EP,US);
F16L33/04 (EP,US);
F01N2450/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | F01N7/18, F16L21/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Abgasrohrverbindung mit Einsatz | [2007/32] | English: | Exhaust pipe joint with insert | [2007/32] | French: | Raccord de conduit d'échappement avec insertion | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 15.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2010 | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | ES | 05.07.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3913955 (TEJA MOHINDAR SINGH) [X] 1-9,21-24 * the whole document * [Y] 10-20; | [DX]US4629226 (CASSEL THOMAS R [US], et al) [DX] 25-32 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9422314U (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]) [A] 2 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 3 * * figures 7-10 *; | [DY]US2004100094 (THOMAS R WINFIELD [US], et al) [DY] 10-20 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2867511 (FAURECIA SYS ECHAPPEMENT [FR]) [A] 1* figure 1 * | Examination | DE10210871 | by applicant | US3913955 |