EP1811462 - Franking machine with vertical transportpath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morel, Bruno 6, impasse de Dr. Kurzenne 78350 Jouy-en-Josas / FR | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07100391.7 | 11.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | FR20060050221 | 23.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0650221 | [2007/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811462 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1811462 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/12, B41J13/28, // G07B17/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
B41J13/12 (EP,US);
B41J13/14 (EP,US);
B41J13/28 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | G07B17/00, B41J13/12, B41J13/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/15] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine mit vertikalen Transportweg | [2007/30] | English: | Franking machine with vertical transportpath | [2007/30] | French: | Machine à affranchir à chemin vertical | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 31.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4893249 (SILVERBERG MORTON [US]) [AD] 1-4 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 9 * * figure - *; | [AD]US4892162 (DOLAN DONALD T [US]) [AD] 1-4 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29911764U (MW MAILTEC FRANKIER KUVERTIER [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 31 - page 9, line 3 ** figures 1,2 * |