EP1811463 - Quick-printing franking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilham, Dennis T. 4, Well Lane Essex CM4 9LT / GB | 02 /
Nguyen, Pierre 24, rue Véron 94140 Alfortville / FR | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07100517.7 | 15.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | FR20060050227 | 23.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0650227 | [2007/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811463 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1811463 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/51] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine mit Schnelldruck | [2007/30] | English: | Quick-printing franking machine | [2007/30] | French: | Machine à affranchir à impression rapide | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0865927 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * column 19, line 21 - column 20, line 31 * * figures 6,9,10; claim 1 * [A] 1,4-6; | [YA]EP1024461 (NEOPOST IND [FR]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0018] , [0023] , [0024] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [YA]US2002039510 (DESHAYES XAVIER [FR], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0031] , [0033] * * figures 1,5,6; claims 1,3,6 *[A] 1,3-5; | [XY]DE10051768 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-6 |