EP1947126 - Bonding agent compound for polymer substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Andreas Wibergstrasse 20 8954 Geroldswil / CH | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Geschäftsstelle Zürich Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07100635.7 | 17.01.2007 | [2008/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947126 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C08G18/76, C08G18/80, C08G18/42, C09J175/04, C08G18/79 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/4208 (EP,US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08G18/776 (EP,US);
C08G18/7831 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C09J175/06 (EP,US);
C09J5/02 (EP,US);
C08G2190/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3158 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Haftvermittlerzusammensetzung für Polymere Substrate | [2008/30] | English: | Bonding agent compound for polymer substrates | [2008/30] | French: | Composition d'agent adhésif pour substrats polymères | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3764365 (DUNCAN J, et al) [A] 1-27* example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5115086 (HSIEH HARRY W S [US]) [A] 1-27 * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]US2003084995 (ZHANG CHUNBIN [US]) [Y] 1-27 * claims 1,6; table I *; | [XY]US2004039113 (MIYATA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 3, paragraph 36; claims 1,2; table 2 * [Y] 1-27 |