EP1835493 - Optical disk and optical disk apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oomachi, Noritake Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Matsumaru, Masaaki Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Ryosuke Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07100896.5 | 22.01.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | JP20060075693 | 17.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006075693 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835493 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835493 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B7/24 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
G11B7/24079 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/42] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Platte und optisches Plattengerät | [2007/38] | English: | Optical disk and optical disk apparatus | [2007/38] | French: | Disque optique et appareil de disque optique | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) TR | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]US2002060979 (TSUKUDA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * [X] 13-20; | [YX]EP1333430 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * page 12; claims 10,11 * * page 2, paragraph 17 * * page 3, paragraph 51 * * page 5, paragraph 65 * [X] 13-20; | [YX]US2005068883 (KONDO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 5, paragraph 70 - page 6, paragraph 85 * * page 10, paragraph 145 - paragraph 155 * * page 13, paragraph 193 * [X] 13-20; | [PA]EP1691352 (RICOH KK [JP]) [PA] 1-12* the whole document *; | [AX] - TOSHIMICHI SHINTANI ET AL, "Analyses of Signals from Dual Layer Phase Change Optical Disks", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO, JP, (200309), vol. 42, no. 9A, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 5624 - 5633, XP002456892 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * [X] 13-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.42.5624 |