EP1947875 - Cell-dependent scanning of groups of profiles of wireless local area networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/30] | Scanning cell-dependent groups of profiles of wireless local area networks | ||
[2009/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abdel-Kader, Sherif 647 Breakwater Crescent Waterloo Ontario N2K 4H7 / CA | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2008/30] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07100949.2 | 22.01.2007 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947875 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947875 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W52/0206 (EP);
H04W84/12 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | 22.01.2007 | BA | 22.01.2007 | HR | 22.01.2007 | MK | 22.01.2007 | RS | 22.01.2007 | Title | German: | Zellabhängige Abtastung von Profilgruppen drahtloser lokaler Netzwerke | [2009/12] | English: | Cell-dependent scanning of groups of profiles of wireless local area networks | [2009/12] | French: | Détection de groupes des profils des réseaux locaux sans fil en fonction de cellules | [2009/12] |
Former [2008/30] | Abtastung von zellabhängigen Profilgruppen drahtloser lokaler Netzwerke | ||
Former [2008/30] | Scanning cell-dependent groups of profiles of wireless local area networks | ||
Former [2008/30] | Détecteur de groupes cellulaires des profils des réseaux locaux sans fil | Examination procedure | 22.01.2007 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 07.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2009 | BE | 19.08.2009 | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IT | 19.08.2009 | LT | 19.08.2009 | LV | 19.08.2009 | NL | 19.08.2009 | PL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | IS | 19.12.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | IE | 22.01.2010 | LU | 22.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | HU | 20.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
LU | 22.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9965270 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - line 20 * * page 3, line 7 - line 15 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 18 * * page 9, line 3 - line 14 *; | [A]US6393006 (KAJIHARA YASUNARI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 60 *; | [A]US2003118015 (GUNNARSSON MAGNUS [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]US2004165563 (HSU RAYMOND T [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0082] * * figures 5b,7 *; | [A]US2005122921 (SEO CHEONG-JEONG [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2005281234 (KAWAMURA YUZURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] *; | [Y]GB2420937 (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 15 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 9 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 4 *; | [A]US2006148487 (KIM JIN-KYEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * | by applicant | US2004165563 | GB2420937 |