EP1796305 - TCP/IP packet-centric wireless transmission system architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE, Building 4 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Van Drebbel Mariner LLC 2215B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5 Las Vegas NV 89119 / US | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Malibu Networks, Inc. Suite 130, 1035 Suncast Lane El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jorgensen, Jacob W. 154 Black Powder Circle Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [2016/07] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
Jorgensen, Jacob W. 154 Black Powder Circle Folsom, CA 95630 / US | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [2016/07] |
Former [2010/22] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Hilleringmann, Jochen Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07101009.4 | 07.07.2000 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | US19990349477 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349477 | US19990349480 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349480 | US19990350126 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350126 | US19990350118 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350118 | US19990347856 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 347856 | US19990350150 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350150 | US19990350156 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350156 | US19990349476 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349476 | US19990350170 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350170 | US19990349481 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349481 | US19990350159 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350159 | US19990347857 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 347857 | US19990349475 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349475 | US19990349483 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349483 | US19990349479 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349479 | US19990350162 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350162 | US19990349975 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349975 | US19990350173 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350173 | US19990349482 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349482 | US19990349478 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349478 | US19990349474 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 349474 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1796305 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1796305 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1796305 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L1/20, H04L12/18, H04L29/06, H04W80/06 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L12/1827 (EP);
H04L47/193 (EP);
H04L47/27 (EP);
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04L69/161 (EP);
H04L69/163 (EP);
H04L69/165 (EP);
H04L69/169 (EP);
H04Q11/0414 (EP);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W28/20 (EP);
H04L12/1836 (EP);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04L69/16 (EP);
H04Q2213/1305 (EP);
H04Q2213/13096 (EP);
H04Q2213/13097 (EP);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP);
H04Q2213/13196 (EP);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP);
H04Q2213/13216 (EP);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP);
H04Q2213/13292 (EP);
H04Q2213/13296 (EP);
H04Q2213/13348 (EP);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP);
H04W28/26 (EP);
H04W72/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | H04W72/04, H04L1/20, H04L12/18, H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L29/06, H04Q11/04 | ||
Former IPC [2007/24] | H04L1/20, H04L12/18, H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L29/06, H04Q7/38, H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2016/07] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TCP/IP-paketzentrierte, drahtlose Übertragungssystemarchitektur | [2007/24] | English: | TCP/IP packet-centric wireless transmission system architecture | [2007/24] | French: | Architecture du système de transmission sans fil orientée paquet TCP/IP | [2015/34] |
Former [2007/24] | Architecture du système de transmission sans fil central du paquet TCP/IP | Examination procedure | 30.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2015 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00947079.0 / EP1197040 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000947079) is 19.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | IE | 07.07.2016 | LU | 07.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/41] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 07.07.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0709982 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,20 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 6 *; | [Y]US5526376 (KELLENBERGER JANE A [US], et al) [Y] 1,20 * column 1 * * column 3 *; | [Y]WO9715154 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1,20 * page 1 - page 15 * * page 17 *; | [Y]US5706048 (DAVIS MARK BRUCE [US]) [Y] 1,20 * column 1 * * column 7 * * column 9 - column 10 *; | [Y]WO9837703 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1,20 * page 1 - page 5 *; | [Y]WO9838814 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1,20 * page 1 - page 3 *; | [Y]WO9916266 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1,20 * page 1 - page 13 * * page 16 * * page 19 - page 21 ** page 25 * | by applicant | WO9837703 | WO9916266 |