EP1876528 - Controlling memory access in a multi-booting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bang, You Seok 109-103, Jooeun Poongrim Apt. 752, Yongdoo-ri, Gongdo-Eup, Anseong-si Gyeongi-do 456-821 / KR | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07101478.1 | 31.01.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | KR20060061799 | 03.07.2006 Original published format: KR 20060061799 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1876528 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1876528 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
G06F9/441 (EP,US);
G06F9/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/01] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speicherzugriffssteuerung in einem Multibootsystem | [2008/02] | English: | Controlling memory access in a multi-booting system | [2008/02] | French: | Contrôle d'accès à la mémoire dans un système à démarrages multiples | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 18.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/08] | 07.10.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9207319 (AST RESEARCH INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 33 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 29 * * page 9, line 2 - page 10, line 29 * * figures 6-8 *; | [A]EP1022655 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0034]; figures 6,7a,7b,7c *; | [A]US6658563 (ICE JR HERBERT JACKSON [US], et al) [A] * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - line 63 *; | [A]US2005015581 (CHEN HUNG-PING [TW]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US2006064571 (TSENG WEI-HSIN [TW]) [A] * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] * |