EP1820881 - Low-K dielectric layers for large substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stowell, Michael W. 809 White Elm Drive Loveland, 80538 / US | 02 /
Dieguez-Campo, Jose M. Sandgasse 59 63457, Hanau / DE | 03 /
Liehr, Michael Friedhofstrasse 27 36325, Feldatal / DE | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Schickedanz, Willi Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | [2007/34] | Application number, filing date | 07101507.7 | 31.01.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | US20060772593P | 10.02.2006 Original published format: US 772593 P | US20060558217 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: US 558217 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820881 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1820881 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/46, H01J17/49 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
C23C16/0227 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/46 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/402 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/50 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01J11/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01J9/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Low-K-Dielektrikschichten für grossflächige Substrate | [2007/34] | English: | Low-K dielectric layers for large substrates | [2007/34] | French: | Couches diélectriques à faible K pour substrats de grande taille | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004185668 (MORITA NOBORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12 * page 8, paragraph 160 - paragraph 166; figure 1; claims 1,7 * * page 7, paragraph 126 - paragraph 129 * * page 3, paragraph 54 - paragraph 55 *; | [A]US2005255257 (CHOI SOO Y [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-12 * page 17; example 4; claims 1,2; tables 16,17 ** page 9, paragraph 126 * |