EP1870516 - Roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrad, Hans-Rolf Friedenstrasse 28 41539 Dormagen / DE | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/35] | Application number, filing date | 07101640.6 | 02.02.2007 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | DE20061028588 | 22.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006028588 | [2007/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870516 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870516 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00, D21G1/02 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
D21G1/02 (EP);
D21G1/008 (EP);
F16C13/00 (EP);
F16C2210/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, IT [2008/36] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Walze | [2007/52] | English: | Roll | [2007/52] | French: | Rouleau | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.08.2012 | AT | 02.02.2013 | FI | 02.02.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/49] | IT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 02.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | IT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE9301059U (SULZER-ESCHER WYSS GMBH, 7980 RAVENSBURG, DE) [YD] 1,2,6 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 2 ** figure - *; | [X]WO02064886 (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * page 3, lines 10-18 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 15 * * page 10, lines 7-34 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 29 * * figure - *; | [YD]DE10358292 (SHW CASTING TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1,2,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] * * figure - * |