EP1956791 - Method and system for authenticating peer devices using EAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salomone, Leonardo Jose Silva 3 Regina St. N, Apt 206 Waterloo Ontario N2J 2Z7 / CA | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07102081.2 | 09.02.2007 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956791 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
H04L63/068 (EP);
H04L63/162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | 09.02.2007 | BA | 09.02.2007 | HR | 09.02.2007 | MK | 09.02.2007 | RS | 09.02.2007 | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Authentifizierung von Peer-Vorrichtungen mittels EAP | [2008/33] | English: | Method and system for authenticating peer devices using EAP | [2008/33] | French: | Procédé et système d'authentification de dispositifs pairs à l'aide de l'EAP | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 28.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 11.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/19] | 28.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004080096 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [1053] - [1057] * * paragraphs [1059] - [1063] * * paragraphs [1088] , [1089] * * figures 2,4A,4B,6B *; | [X]WO2005043282 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0082] - [0088] * * paragraphs [0096] - [0098] * * figures 1,7,9 *; | [X] - OHBA TOSHIBA S DAS TELCORDIA Y, "An EAP Method for EAP Extension (EAP-EXT)", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20070104), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015050280 [X] 1-21 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line L * * page 10, lines 4-13 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - SUN-HWA LIM ET AL, "Design and Performance Analysis of Authentication Scheme for Interworking between High-speed Portable Internet (HPi) System and Wireless Local Area Networks (WLANs)", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2004. VTC2004-FALL. 2004 IEEE 60TH LOS ANGELES, CA, USA 26-29 SEPT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040926), ISBN 0-7803-8521-7, pages 3569 - 3573, XP010787541 [A] 1-21 * sections III.A, III.B * * figures 2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1404729 | by applicant | WO2004080096 |