EP1830265 - Method of providing partially isolated execution environment for multiple applications and digital information apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Chong-mok 106-1804, Samsung Raemian Apt., 162, Songpa 2-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Chung, Seung-bum 1302, GS Ingye Xi, 1124-1, Ingye-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Ho-bum 105-1804, Hwanggol Maeul 1-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jung, Un-gyo 106-1003, Pungseong Sinmiju Apt., 895, Gian-ri, T Taean-eup, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2007/36] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07102548.0 | 16.02.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | KR20060017762 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: KR 20060017762 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830265 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830265 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48, G06F9/455 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/485 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/45504 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | G06F9/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/37] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer teilisolierten Ausführungsumgebung für mehrere Anwendungen sowie digitale Informationsvorrichtung für dessen Verwendung | [2007/36] | English: | Method of providing partially isolated execution environment for multiple applications and digital information apparatus using the same | [2007/36] | French: | Procédé de fourniture d'un environnement d'exécution partiellement isolé pour des applications multiples et appareil d'informations numériques l'utilisant | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0163412 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 5, lines 1-5 ** page 6, line 25 - page 16, line 35; figures 1/11-11/11; claims 1-30 *; | [X]GB2365554 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 6, line 30; figures 1-6 * * page 7, line 15 - page 21, column 5; claims 1-34 *; | [X]US6931544 (KIENHOEFER JUERGEN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 35 * * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 67; claims 1-11 *; | [A] - BACK G, "ISOLATION, RESOURCE MANAGEMENT AND SHARING IN THE KAFFEOS JAVA RUNTIME SYSTEM", DISSERTATION SUBMITTED TO THE FACULTY OF THE UNIVERSITY OF UTAHIN PARTIAL FULFILLMENT OF THE REQUIREMENTS FOR THE DEGREE OFDOCTOR OF PHILOSOPHY, XX, XX, (20020501), page COMPLETE175, XP002294611 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - CZAJKOWSKI G, "Application isolation in the Java DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/354222.353195 |