EP1826994 - Apparatus and method for controlling bell sound in portable terminal having hard disc drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahn, Chi-Hun c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/35] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07102631.4 | 19.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | KR20060018242 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: KR 20060018242 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1826994 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1826994 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M19/04 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
H04M19/041 (EP,US);
B22D17/2218 (KR);
H04M1/72442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/19] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Klingeltonsteuerung bei einem tragbaren Endgerät mit einem Festplattenlaufwerk | [2007/35] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling bell sound in portable terminal having hard disc drive | [2007/35] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle du son d'une sonnerie dans un terminal portable comportant une commande de disque dur | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 15.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/25] | 05.02.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1028425 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8* paragraphs [0007] , [0017] , [0042] *; | [Y]US2004067751 (VANDERMEIJDEN TOM R [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0059] - [0060] * * claims 6-9 * | by applicant | EP1028425 | US2004067751 |