EP1873126 - Anti-Glare Glass Substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Glass Co., Ltd. 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi / JP | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuda, Yasutaka c/o Glass Research Center Central Glass Co., Ltd 1510 Okuchi-cho Matsuzaka-shi Mie / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Katsuto c/o Glass Research Center Central Glass Co., Ltd 1510 Okuchi-cho Matsuzaka-shi Mie / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07102765.0 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | JP20060044713 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006044713 | JP20060080506 | 23.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006080506 | JP20060261745 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006261745 | JP20060261746 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006261746 | JP20060340973 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006340973 | JP20060340974 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006340974 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873126 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C03C1/00, G02B1/11 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G02B1/11 (EP,US);
C03C1/008 (EP,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C03C17/009 (EP,US);
C03C2217/213 (EP,US);
C03C2217/42 (EP,US);
C03C2217/478 (EP,US);
C03C2217/77 (EP,US);
C03C2218/113 (EP,US);
C09K2323/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/37] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blendfreies Glassubstrat | [2008/01] | English: | Anti-Glare Glass Substrate | [2008/01] | French: | Substrat vitreux antireflet | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0545258 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0597490 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * example - *; | [A]WO9531413 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 5-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP1061585 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * example - *; | [A]WO0132578 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure - *; | [AD]JP2004240548 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1574881 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0074] *; | [A]US2005286009 (NAKAGAWA TAKEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] * |