EP1965342 - Method of conducting a transaction between a payment module and a security module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagracard S.A. Route de Genève 22-24 1033 Cheseaux-sur Lausanne / CH | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudelski, Henri Chemin du Daillard 35 1071, Chexbres / CH | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2008/36] | Application number, filing date | 07103102.5 | 27.02.2007 | [2008/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965342 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, H04N7/167, H04N5/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/06 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G07F7/082 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
G07F7/0873 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4185 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/19] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausführen einer Transaktion zwischen einem Zahlungsmodul und einem Sicherheitsmodul | [2008/36] | English: | Method of conducting a transaction between a payment module and a security module | [2008/36] | French: | Procédé pour effectuer une transaction entre un module de paiement et un module de sécurité | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9740616 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [X] 1 * page 16, line 15 - page 27, line 28 * * page 40, line 10 - page 42, line 17 *; | [A]GB2329736 (NDS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 12, line 1 - page 14, line 22 * * page 15, line 9 - page 20, line 7 * * page 22, line 1 - page 22, line 20 * * page 26, line 7 - page 27, line 14 *; | [XA]WO0152124 (SCM MICROSYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 4 * * page 8, line 1 - page 8, line 26 * [A] 2-7,10; | [A]EP1353501 (NAGRAVISION SA [CH]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]DE10354029 (SCM MICROSYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2006031899 (RABIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0059] ** paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] * |