EP1826376 - Automatic internal combustion engine stop device, internal combustion engine provided with the same and automatic internal combustion engine stop method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-Cho Kariya City Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-Cho Kariya City Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-Cho Kariya City Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Shigenori DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07103152.0 | 27.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | JP20060052672 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006052672 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826376 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1826376 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D17/04, F02N11/08 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
F02D17/04 (EP,US);
F02D41/042 (EP,US);
F02N11/0818 (EP,US);
F02P5/1502 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0095 (EP,US);
F02N19/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/19] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatische Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anhalten einer Brennkraftmaschine und Brennkraftmaschine damit versehen | [2007/35] | English: | Automatic internal combustion engine stop device, internal combustion engine provided with the same and automatic internal combustion engine stop method | [2007/35] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'arrêt automatique de moteur à combustion interne et moteur à combustion interne fourni avec celui-ci | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 18.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4074665 (PATIS BRUCE L) [A] 1* column 1, lines 23-54 *; | [A]FR2827911 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 7-20; figure -; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP1477654 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] * |