EP1887515 - Colour binning of a digital image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phase One A/S Roskildevej 39 2000 Frederiksberg / DK | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Thomas Grønnevej 56 Lellinge 4600, Køge / DK | [2011/52] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
Andersen, Thomas Grønnevej 56 Lellinge 4600, Køge / DK | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2008/07] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 07103154.6 | 27.02.2007 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887515 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887515 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G06T3/4015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Extension states | AL | 08.05.2008 | BA | 08.05.2008 | HR | 08.05.2008 | MK | 08.05.2008 | RS | 08.05.2008 | Title | German: | Farb-Binning eines digitalen Bildes | [2008/07] | English: | Colour binning of a digital image | [2008/07] | French: | Groupement de couleurs d'une image numérique | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 25.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2007 | AT | 28.12.2011 | BE | 28.12.2011 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IT | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | IE | 27.02.2012 | LU | 27.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 27.02.2012 | ||
LU | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.12.2011 | |
BE | 28.12.2011 | ||
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 28.12.2011 | |
CY | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6714242 (KOBAYASHI ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * column 3, paragraph 55 - paragraph 63 * * column 5, paragraph 10 - paragraph 29 * [A] ; | [A]US6724932 (ITO WATARU [JP]) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [X]US2005002589 (WALMSLEY SIMON ROBERT [AU], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0315] - paragraph [0323] * | by applicant | US2006203113 |