EP1835273 - Magnetic torque sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg, 2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-6190 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maehara, Hideo Kayaba Industry Co., Ltd WTC Building, 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chrome Tokyo 105 6190 / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Helga Claire Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Chapman, Helga Claire Chapman Molony 20 Staple Gardens Winchester SO23 8SR / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Chapman, Helga Claire Chapman Molony Renshaw Barns Upper Woodford Salisbury SP4 6FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07103162.9 | 27.02.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | JP20060067355 | 13.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006067355 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835273 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835273 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, B62D6/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
B62D6/10 (EP,US);
G01L3/104 (EP,US);
G01L5/221 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | G01L3/10 | Designated contracting states | [2009/46] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetischer Drehmomentsensor | [2007/38] | English: | Magnetic torque sensor | [2007/38] | French: | Capteur magnétique de couple | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH0611402 (UNISIA JECS CORP) [DY] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US2003209087 (NAKANE NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1,5,8,9 * * claims 1-25 *; | [Y]WO2005108943 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | EP1752749 [ ] (JTEKT CORP [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0062] * * claims 1-10 ** figures 1,3,4,10,18 * |