EP1970482 - Home laundry drier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | ||
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Belgicastraat 17 1930 Zaventem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favret, Ugo Via Morassutti, 12 33072 Casarsa / IT | 02 /
Noviello, Flavio Via Grandi, 7 33081 Aviano / IT | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development 90327 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Bellemo, Matteo, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07104075.2 | 13.03.2007 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970482 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970482 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/26 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
D06F58/203 (EP,US);
D06F34/14 (EP,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
D06F58/26 (EP,US);
D06F2103/00 (EP,US);
D06F2103/18 (EP,US);
D06F2105/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner für den Haushalt | [2008/38] | English: | Home laundry drier | [2008/38] | French: | Sèche-linge domestique | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | IE | 13.03.2011 | LU | 13.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 13.03.2011 | ||
LU | 13.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 13.03.2011 | ||
LU | 13.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 13.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1469120 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0057]; figures 3-7 *; | [XA]DE102005053702 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0140]; figure 9 * [A] 8-11; | [A]WO2006101336 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP1734170 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102005053702 |