EP1837007 - Sprayable sun protection lotion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mundt, Claudia Holunderstrasse 89 a 28207, Bremen / DE | 02 /
Skubsch, Kerstin Hermanstrasse 30 25421, Pinneberg / DE | 03 /
Windisch, Björna Lenbachstrasse 2 22607, Hamburg / DE | 04 /
Weingarz, Yvonne Hohenzollernring 111 22763, Hamburg / DE | [2007/39] | Application number, filing date | 07104083.6 | 14.03.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | DE20061013283 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013283 | [2007/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837007 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837007 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61K8/29, A61K8/37, A61K8/49, A61K8/81, A61Q17/04 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/733 (EP);
A61K8/046 (EP);
A61K8/25 (EP);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Sprühbare Sonnenschutzlotion | [2007/39] | English: | Sprayable sun protection lotion | [2007/39] | French: | Lotion solaire pouvant être vaporisée | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0559319 (TIOXIDE SPECIALTIES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,7,8,10,20 ** page 4; example 1 *; | [X]FR2744914 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,8,18-22 * * pages 24-25; examples 3,4 *; | [X]GB2338650 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1-11 * claim 1 * * pages 6-8; examples 2,3 * * page 7, lines 1-5 *; | [X]EP1284129 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * pages 11-12; examples 1,3,4 *; | [X]DE10141473 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * pages 5-6, paragraph 30 * * pages 11-14; example 3 *; | [X]WO2004085412 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 35; example 12 *; | [E]EP1813266 (OREAL [FR]) [E] 1-11 * page 11, paragraph 95 * * pages 13-14; example 1 *; | [X] - NN, "Sun Protection Spray (O/W) with Eusolex T-Aqua #ST-02-05", EMD RONA COSMETIC BUSINESS UNIT, (20060317), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060317025425/http://www.emdchemicals.com/rona/Formulations/ST-02-05.pdf, (20080515), XP002480346 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |