EP1972927 - Microelectronic sensor device for detecting label particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verschuren, Coen Adrianus c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V Groenewoudseweg1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Bruls, Dominique Maria c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V Groenewoudseweg1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Immink, Albert Hendrik Jan c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
De Theije, Femke Karina c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V Groenewoudseweg1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Van Der Wijk, Thea c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V Groenewoudseweg1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
Van Der Lee, Alexander Marc c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
Schleipen, Johannes Joseph, Hubertina Barbara c/o Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V, High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Plünnecke, Ingo Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Plünnecke, Ingo Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07104098.4 | 14.03.2007 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972927 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G01N21/648 (EP);
G01N21/552 (EP);
G01N21/6428 (EP);
G01N21/6452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/22] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikroelektronische Sensorvorrichtung zum Erkennen von Markierungspartikeln | [2008/39] | English: | Microelectronic sensor device for detecting label particles | [2008/39] | French: | Dispositif capteur microélectronique pour la détection de particules de marquage | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1079226 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1,12,17,20 * figures 1,5 * [Y] 6-8; | [X]EP1650547 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,11,12,20,21 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0125]; figures 16,17; claim 12 *; | [Y]WO2007010469 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 6-8 * figure 1 *; | [X] - BLICKLE V, ET AL, "Evanescent light scattering wtih magnetic colloids", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2005), vol. 87, no. 101102, pages 1 - 3, XP002453212 [X] 1,12,20 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2035888 |