EP1834878 - Method of packaging phials in a sterile environment, and apparatus for carrying out the aforesaid method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/38] | Method for packaging of phials in a sterile environment, and apparatus for carrying out the aforesaid method | ||
[2009/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dovesi, Pietro Via G. Leopardi 3 40065 Pianoro (Bologna) / IT | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo Invention S.r.l. Via delle Armi 1 40137 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo Invention S.r.l. Via delle Armi, 1 40137 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 07104108.1 | 14.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00183 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060183 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834878 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834878 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/00, B65B55/02, B65B55/10, B67C7/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP,US);
B65B55/027 (EP,US);
B65B55/10 (EP,US);
B65B55/24 (EP);
B67C7/0073 (EP,US);
B67C2003/228 (EP,US);
B67C2003/2694 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verpackung von Phiolen in einer sterilen Umgebung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [2007/38] | English: | Method of packaging phials in a sterile environment, and apparatus for carrying out the aforesaid method | [2009/03] | French: | Méthode d'emballage de fioles dans un environnement stérile, et appareil pour mettre en oeuvre ce procédé | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/38] | Method for packaging of phials in a sterile environment, and apparatus for carrying out the aforesaid method | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | BE | 02.09.2009 | BG | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | LT | 02.09.2009 | LV | 02.09.2009 | MT | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SE | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | IS | 02.01.2010 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | IE | 14.03.2010 | LU | 14.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
MT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.03.2010 | ||
LU | 14.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
MT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
BG | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
MT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 14.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
MT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 14.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
MT | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 14.03.2010 | ||
IT | 14.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IE | 14.03.2010 | ||
IT | 14.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0089613 (BAUSCH & STROEBEL MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1,5* page 18, lines 22-31; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP1447328 (PROBITAS PHARMA SA [ES]) [X] 1,4,5,9 * column 2, lines 3-23; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,6,7; | [Y]WO2004076288 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,7 * page 17; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005087592 (MEDICAL INSTILL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 7, lines 29,30 * * page 8, lines 17-27; figure 2 * |