EP1843023 - Adaptation method for the injection system of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Karl Aachener Str. 6 30173, Hannover / DE | 02 /
Zimmer, Christian Burgunder Str. 15 93053, Regensburg / DE | [2007/41] | Application number, filing date | 07104640.3 | 22.03.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20061015967 | 05.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006015967 | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1843023 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1843023 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/12, F02D41/24 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
F02D41/12 (EP,US);
F02D41/247 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2048 (EP,US);
F02D2200/025 (EP,US);
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F02D41/123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Adaptionsverfahren einer Einspritzanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2007/41] | English: | Adaptation method for the injection system of a combustion engine | [2007/41] | French: | Procédé d'adaptation de dispositif d'injection de moteur thermique | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9917010 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 18 *; | [A]EP0959237 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 3,4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] *; | [A]EP1116946 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [A]DE10305656 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3* paragraphs [0027] , [0033] *; | [X]EP1388661 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0044] - [0047] *; | [XY]WO2004053316 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * page 13, line 9 - page 15, line 35 * * figure 4 * [Y] 3; | [A]WO2005042952 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 3 * claims 1,10 * * column 9, lines 8-13 * |