EP1820645 - Rotary printing press with a folding assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/34] | Roller rotary printing press with a folding assembly | ||
[2012/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Günther Riedstr. 18 97225, Zellingen / DE | 02 /
Herbert, Burkard Ludwigkai 28 97072, Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Hohmann, Lothar Albrecht-Dürer-Str. 19 97250, Erlabrunn / DE | 04 /
Masuch, Bernd Am Tiergarten 51 97273, Kürnach / DE | 05 /
Weschenfelder, Kurt Lerchenweg 1 97299, Zell/Main / DE | [2012/36] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
Eckert, Günther Riedstr. 18 97225, Zellingen / DE | ||
02 /
Herbert, Burkard Ludwigkai 28 97072, Würzburg / DE | |||
03 /
Hohmann, Lothar Albrecht-Dürer-Str. 19 97250, Erlabrunn / DE | |||
04 /
Masuch, Bernd Am Tiergarten 51 97273, Kürnach / DE | |||
05 /
Weschenfelder, Kurt Lerchenweg 1 97299, Zell/Main / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 07104665.0 | 29.04.2005 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | DE20041022231 | 04.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004022231 | DE20041030062 | 23.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004030062 | DE20041033923 | 14.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004033923 | US20040631421P | 30.11.2004 Original published format: US 631421 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820645 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1820645 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820645 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/54, B41F13/58, B41F13/06, B65H45/22 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
B41F13/06 (EP,US);
B41F13/54 (EP,US);
B41F13/58 (EP,US);
B65H45/225 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | B41F13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine mit einem Falzaufbau | [2007/34] | English: | Rotary printing press with a folding assembly | [2012/19] | French: | Presse rotative dotée d'un dispositif de pliage | [2012/19] |
Former [2007/34] | Roller rotary printing press with a folding assembly | ||
Former [2007/34] | Presse rotative dotée d'une construction de pli | Examination procedure | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 22.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05749772.9 / EP1742796 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050749772) is 08.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2005 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | AT | 29.04.2013 | GB | 29.04.2013 | IE | 29.04.2013 | LU | 29.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | FR | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
AT | 29.04.2013 | ||
GB | 29.04.2013 | ||
IE | 29.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
AT | 29.04.2013 | ||
GB | 29.04.2013 | ||
IE | 29.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 29.04.2013 | ||
IE | 29.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 29.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 29.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4128797 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1072551 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |