EP1793249 - Optical switches and routers and optical filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arryx, Inc. 316 North Michigan Avenue Chicago, IL 60601 / US | For all designated states Bradley, Kenneth A. 424 North Garfield Avenue Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bradley, Kenneth A. 424 North Garfield Avenue Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | 02 /
Lopes, Ward 138 Dwight Road Springfield, MA 01108 / US | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
Bradley, Kenneth A. 424 North Garfield Avenue Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | ||
02 /
Lopes, Ward 1519 E. 54th Street, Apt. 4 Chicago, IL 60615 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2007/23] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07104668.4 | 20.06.2002 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | US20010886698 | 20.06.2001 Original published format: US 886698 | US20020118532 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 118532 | US20020118531 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 118531 | US20020118709 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 118709 | US20020118760 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 118760 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793249 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1793249 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28, G02F1/313, G02F1/01, G02B6/12 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
G02F1/011 (EP);
G02B6/2706 (EP);
G02B6/29338 (EP);
G02B6/29341 (EP);
G02B6/29343 (EP);
G02B6/2935 (EP);
G02B6/29395 (EP);
G02F1/3132 (EP);
G02F2203/15 (EP);
G02F2203/585 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE SCHALTER UND ROUTER UND OPTISCHE FILTER | [2007/31] | English: | Optical switches and routers and optical filters | [2007/23] | French: | COMMUTATEURS ET ROUTEURS OPTIQUES ET FILTRES OPTIQUES | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/23] | Optische Schalter und Router und optische Filter | ||
Former [2007/23] | Commutateurs et routeurs optiques et filters optiques | Examination procedure | 22.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02747920.3 / EP1410080 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8302168 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [X] 13,14 * figures 5,6B,6C * * page 16, line 1 - line 9 * * page 17, line 17 - line 31 * [Y] 11,12; | [X]US4720160 (HICKS JR JOHN W [US]) [X] 11-14 * figures 10,23 * * column 12, line 29 - line 37 * * column 13, line 15 - line 28 ** column 13, line 56 - column 14, line 5 *; | [XY]US6052495 (LITTLE BRENT E [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 3-10B * * column 3, line 46 - column 8, line 28 * [Y] 5-8,11,12; | [Y]WO0029886 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [Y] 5-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US6101300 (FAN SHANHUI [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6195187 (SOREF RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8 |