EP1903750 - Load distributing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Masayuki c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07104793.0 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | JP20060256350 | 21.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006256350 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903750 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/50 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F11/18 (EP,US);
G06F11/3433 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F9/46 (KR);
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/1029 (EP,US);
H04L67/62 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lastverteilungsvorrichtung | [2008/13] | English: | Load distributing apparatus | [2008/13] | French: | Appareil de distribution de charge | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 27.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9826559 (GTE INTERNETWORKING INC [US]) [A] 6-9 * page 17, paragraph L - page 19, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US6308316 (HASHIMOTO SHIN [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 45 - line 51 * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 35 *; | [XA]US6363496 (KWIAT KEVIN ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1,2,4-11 * column 1, line 13 - line 54 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 62 * * column 5, line 24 - line 55 * * column 7, line 1 - line 10 * * claim 1 * [A] 3; | [A]US2004186904 (OLIVEIRA MARCELO GOMES [US]) [A] 6-9 * paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0023] *; | [A] - ANDERSON D P ET AL, "SETI home: an experiment in public-resource computing", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200211), vol. 45, no. 11, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 56 - 61, XP002436446 [A] 1-11 * page 57, column M, line 3 - page 58, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/581571.581573 | by applicant | JPH08235133 | US6363496 |