EP1847823 - Tyre equipped with a sensor placed between the casing ply and the inner lining. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Societe de Technologie Michelin STM 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique Route Louis-Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertrand, David 2, rue du Général Delestraint 25000, BESANCON / FR | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Randl, Oliver Georg, et al M.F.P. MICHELIN 23, Place des Carmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Randl, Oliver Georg, et al M.F.P. MICHELIN 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2007/43] | Le Cam, Stéphane Georges Elie Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Charmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35- Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07104881.3 | 26.03.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | FR20060002805 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0602805 | [2007/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1847823 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1847823 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02, G01L5/22, G01L5/16 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
G01M17/02 (EP);
B60C23/0493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reifen versehen mit einem Sensor zwischen der Gehäuseeinlage und dem Innengummi | [2007/43] | English: | Tyre equipped with a sensor placed between the casing ply and the inner lining. | [2007/43] | French: | Pneumatique pourvu d'un capteur placé entre la nappe carcasse et la gomme intérieure. | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0937615 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 5c * * sentences 26-31, paragraph 8 *; | [X]US2003056579 (POULBOT VALERY [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12 * figures 2b,16,17 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0087] , [0088] , [0107] *; | [X]US2004158441 (BERTRAND DAVID [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-12 * figures 11,12 * * paragraph [0013] *; | [A]WO2005108123 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1* figures 5,6 * |