EP1840595 - On-vehicle radar device and on-vehicle radar device control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU TEN LIMITED 2-28 Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honda, Kanako c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | 02 /
Isaji, Osamu c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | 03 /
Shirakawa, Kazuo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Ohkubo, Naofumi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Seki, Tetsuo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
Honda, Kanako c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
Isaji, Osamu c/o Fujitsu Ten Limited 2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome, Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | |||
03 /
Shirakawa, Kazuo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Ohkubo, Naofumi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Seki, Tetsuo c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/40] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07104886.2 | 26.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060092964 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006092964 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1840595 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1840595 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840595 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G01S7/36 (EP,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S13/345 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/023 (EP,US);
G01S7/0232 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/27] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugradarvorrichtung und Steuersystem für eine Fahrzeugradarvorrichtung | [2007/40] | English: | On-vehicle radar device and on-vehicle radar device control system | [2007/40] | French: | Dispositif de radar sur véhicule et système de contrôle de dispositif de radar sur véhicule | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 25.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2010 | 16.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4088955 (BAGHDADY ELIE J) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 1 - line 42 *; | [A]US5497162 (KAISER STEPHEN G [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 4, line 39 - line 54 *; | [A]DE19538309 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 2 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE19642810 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3,4 * figures 1b,3a *; | [X]US6087928 (KLEINBERG RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 3,4 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002003488 (LEVIN MOSHE [IL], et al) [X] 5,6 * paragraphs [0054] , [0082] , [0086] , [0060] , [0115]; figures 2,5 *; | [A]WO2004048999 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 9, line 1 - line 33; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2408645 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3,4* figures 3,6 *; | [X]US2005179584 (OHLSSON MAGNUS [SE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US2002003488 | US2005179584 |