EP1840792 - Optical communication system, optical reader, and method of reading information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Tadashi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07105102.3 | 28.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060089009 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006089009 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840792 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840792 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K19/07 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G06K7/1097 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/0728 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Kommunikationssystem, optisches Lesegerät und Informationsleseverfahren | [2007/40] | English: | Optical communication system, optical reader, and method of reading information | [2007/40] | French: | Système de communication optique, lecteur optique, et procédé de lecture d'informations | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4916296 (STRECK DONALD A [US]) [A] 1-6* figure 9; claim 1 *; | [A]US5241161 (ZUTA MARC [IL]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 20 - line 28; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1531341 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] *; | [DA]JP2006011948 (NTT COMM KK) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | US5241161 | EP1531341 | JP2006011948 |