EP1818075 - Apparatus for facilitating wound healing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biofisica, LLC 1961 Travers Circle Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andino, Rafael c/o Biofisica, LLC 1961 Travers Circle 30044 Lawrenceville, GA / US | 02 /
Brooks, Christopher c/o Biofisica, LLC 1961 Travers Circle 30044 Lawrenceville, GA / US | 03 /
Van Royen, Donald c/o Biofisica, LLC 1961 Travers Circle 30044 Lawrenceville, GA / US | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105205.4 | 31.05.2002 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | US20010872956 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: US 872956 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818075 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/20, A61N1/32 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
A61N1/0468 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
A61N1/205 (EP,US);
A61N1/0476 (EP,US);
A61N1/0496 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Fördern der Wundheilung | [2007/33] | English: | Apparatus for facilitating wound healing | [2007/33] | French: | Appareil pour faciliter la cicatrisation | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02741804.5 / EP1395332 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4619252 (IBBOTT JACK K [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 2; figure - *; | [X]US5395398 (ROGOZINSKI WALLACE J [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 54; figure - *; | [AD]US5433735 (ZANAKIS MICHAEL F [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9826838 (VIDACARE INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 28; figure - *; | [A]US5853424 (RISE MARK T [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 55; figure - *; | [A]EP0947214 (BANGAHDO KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, column 4, line 28 - page 4, column 6, line 25; figure - *; | [X]WO0065993 (LEONHARD LANG KG [AT], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 2; figure - * |