EP1845341 - Rotation angle detection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Toru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Inte Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Masaru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Inte Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
Segawa, Masami c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Inte Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105529.7 | 03.04.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | JP20060111772 | 14.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006111772 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1845341 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rotationswinkelerkennungsvorrichtung | [2007/42] | English: | Rotation angle detection apparatus | [2007/42] | French: | Appareil de détection d'angle de rotation | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |