EP1857029 - Floor element and method for making a floor element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyflex ApS Norgesvej 4-8 7480 Vildbjerg / DK | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sørensen, Villy Juhl Mejsevej 16 7430 Ikast / DK | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2007/47] | Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 07105550.3 | 03.04.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | DK20060000508 | 07.04.2006 Original published format: DK 200600508 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1857029 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1857029 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857029 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/40 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
A47K3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bodenelement und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/47] | English: | Floor element and method for making a floor element | [2007/47] | French: | Elément de plancher et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2007 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 03.04.2007 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1574433 (NOBLE C W) [A] 3 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2306495 (FILTEC LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE10060401 (DREWES MARTINA [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 1 - column 4; figure 2 *; | [A]DE10146812 (GHETMIRI MEHDI [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2382769 (CUNDICK TERENCE LUTHER [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6643863 (GERBER LLOYD [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1 - column 4; figures 1,3 *; | [XY]DE202004004277U (ALTURA LEIDEN HOLDING [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012]; figure 1 * [Y] 1-12 |