EP1845126 - Dual cure resin composite system and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/33] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Wendy-Ling / 776 Saint David Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
YANG, Wenliang Patrick / 8 Birch Hill Road Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | [2013/33] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
LIN, Wendy-Ling 776 Saint David Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
YANG, Wenliang Patrick 8 Birch Hill Road Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/33] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07105592.5 | 04.04.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | US20060403674 | 13.04.2006 Original published format: US 403674 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1845126 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1845126 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845126 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/12 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
C08J5/12 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (BR);
B32B27/00 (BR);
B32B27/08 (BR);
B32B27/16 (BR);
B32B37/00 (BR);
B32B37/06 (BR);
B32B7/00 (BR);
B32B7/04 (BR);
B32B7/10 (BR);
B29C35/08 (BR);
B32B27/26 (BR);
B32B38/18 (BR);
C08F2/46 (BR);
C08G18/08 (BR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, NL [2010/04] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zweifach gehärtetes Harzverbundsystem und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2007/42] | English: | Dual cure resin composite system and method of manufacturing the same | [2007/42] | French: | Système composite de résine dual-cure et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 21.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02098657 (SAINT GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLAST [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claim - *; | [X]WO03078477 (MUSHOVIC JOHN N [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * claim 1 * * example IV *; | [X]WO2004035651 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * claims 1,10,15,19 * * page 42, lines 13-22 * * example - *; | [A]EP1645607 (LIU KUN-CHUNG [TW]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO03078477 | WO2004035651 |