EP1852739 - Colour liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Gesellschaft für moderne Informationssysteme mbH Söflinger Strasse 100 89077 Ulm / DE | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayrle, Reiner Keplerstrasse 11 89129 Langenau / DE | 02 /
Bitter, Thomas Magnusstrasse 12/1 73342 Bad Ditzenbach / DE | 03 /
Bader, Otto Schützenweg 3 88447 Warthausen / DE | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105599.0 | 04.04.2007 | [2007/45] | Priority number, date | DE20061017564 | 13.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006017564 | [2007/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1852739 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1852739 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1347 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
G02F1/1347 (EP,US);
G02F1/133377 (EP,US);
G02F1/13478 (EP,US);
G02F2201/52 (EP,US);
G02F2203/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Title | German: | Farb-Flüssigkristallanzeigeeinrichtung | [2007/45] | English: | Colour liquid crystal display device | [2007/45] | French: | Dispositif couleur à écran à cristaux liquides | [2007/45] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | IE | 06.01.2010 | LT | 06.01.2010 | LV | 06.01.2010 | MT | 06.01.2010 | PL | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SE | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | TR | 06.01.2010 | LU | 04.04.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | GR | 07.04.2010 | ES | 17.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | PT | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
LU | 04.04.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
MT | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 04.04.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
IT | 04.04.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SE | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 06.01.2010 | |
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | SI | 06.01.2010 | |
ES | 17.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5015074 (CLERC JEAN-FREDERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 3b ** und die zugehörigen Textpassagen *; | [DA]JPH1054996 (SHARP KK) [DA] 1-16 * figures 7,9 * * und die zugehörigen Textpassagen *; | [A]WO03071347 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 4 * * und die zugehörigen Textpassagen *; | [A]US2005094059 (NOGUCHI TAKAFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006061530 (YUASA SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figure 4 * * und die zugehörigen Textpassagen * |