EP1977981 - Automated piece goods warehousing with inclined storage trays and a locking device at the lower end operated by an actuating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rowa Automatisierungssysteme GmbH Rowastrasse 1 - 3 53539 Kelberg / DE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Dietmar Auf dem Hermes 6 53539 Kelberg / DE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Zenz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Schmidt, Frank-Michael, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105600.6 | 04.04.2007 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977981 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977981 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/08, G07F11/32 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B65G1/08 (EP);
G07F11/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | Automatisiertes Stückgutlager mit geneigten Lagerschächten, die an ihrem unteren Ende eine von einem Bediengerät betätigbare Sperrvorrichtung aufweisen | [2008/41] | English: | Automated piece goods warehousing with inclined storage trays and a locking device at the lower end operated by an actuating device | [2008/41] | French: | Entrepôt automatisé doté de puits de stockage inclinés comportant un dispositif de verrouillage actionnable par un appareil de commande sur son extrémité inférieure | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/41] | Marchandise en colis automatisée dotée d'un puits de stockage incliné comportant un dispositif de verrouillage actionnable par un appareil de commande sur son extrémité inférieure | Examination procedure | 11.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 16.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | IE | 23.12.2009 | IT | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | MT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | PL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | ES | 03.04.2010 | LU | 04.04.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
LU | 04.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | CZ | 23.12.2009 | |
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3991907 (KULL LEO) [A] * column 14, line 26 - line 44; figures 19,23 *; | [A]JPH1186120 (SHINKO MECS KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1321384 (BAUMUELLER ANLAGEN SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [A] * paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [A]EP1439502 (CENTRAL BOTTLING CO [IL]) [A] * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figure - *; | [A]EP1684244 (COCA COLA CO [US]) [A] * paragraph [0139]; figures 23-32 * | by applicant | DE4336885 | JPH1186120 | DE19635396 | DE29817529U | DE19724377 | WO0058189 | WO02063579 | DE20214241U | DE202004020325U | EP1762511 |