EP1932992 - Height-adjustable first bearing unit for a trolley [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | [2014/13] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | ||
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states W. HAUTAU GMBH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUEGGE, Dirk Untere Strasse 24 31688, Nienstaedt / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
MUEGGE, Dirk Ring Strasse 30 31688, Nienstaed / DE | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2014/12] |
Former [2008/25] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105687.3 | 04.04.2007 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | DE20061059572 | 16.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059572 | [2008/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1932992 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1932992 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1932992 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/10, E05D15/06 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
E05D15/1013 (EP);
E05D15/0669 (EP);
E05Y2201/60 (EP);
E05Y2201/624 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/25] | E05D15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | Höhen-verstellbare erste Lagereinheit für einen Laufwagen | [2008/33] | English: | Height-adjustable first bearing unit for a trolley | [2008/25] | French: | Unité de palier ajustable en hauteur pour chariot | [2008/25] |
Former [2008/25] | HOEHEN-VERSTELLBARE ERSTE LAGEREINHEIT FUER EINEN LAUFWAGEN | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2007 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | IE | 04.04.2014 | LU | 04.04.2014 | FR | 26.05.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | GB | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.04.2014 | ||
FR | 26.05.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.04.2014 | ||
FR | 26.05.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.04.2014 | ||
FR | 26.05.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.04.2014 | ||
FR | 26.05.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.04.2014 | ||
FR | 26.05.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GB | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 04.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1899175 (WILLARD DONALD E) [A] 1-25 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2096311 (VAL STROUGH J) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 22 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2071201 (PFAEFFLI W) [A] 1-25 * figures 8,9 *; | [A]US4590707 (VON RESCH JUELIUES M [DE]) [A] 1-25* column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 16; figure 5 *; | [A]AU602314B (HIGHLAND BOND PTY LTD) [A] 1-25 * figure 1 *; | [AD]EP1378624 (SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE]) [AD] 1-25 * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] , [0039]; figures 4-6 * | by applicant | US1899175 | US2096311 | GB2071201 | AU6358286 | EP1378624 |