EP1843572 - Bitmapped based trapping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yao, Meng 2925 White Salmon Street West Linn, OR 97068 / US | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07105733.5 | 05.04.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | US20060399245 | 06.04.2006 Original published format: US 399245 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1843572 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1843572 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843572 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/58 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bitmapbasiertes Trapping | [2007/41] | English: | Bitmapped based trapping | [2007/41] | French: | Piègeage à base de mode point | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 06.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0160526 (CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,8,9 * column 16, lines 38-42 * * column 11, lines 52,53 *; | [A]EP0322680 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1,3,8-10 * page 6, lines 8-30 * * page 2, lines 18-23 * * page 1, lines 3-7 *; | [A]EP0484890 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 10, lines 28-39; figures 1,8a-b *; | [A]WO2005053308 (ELECTRONICS FOR IMAGING INC [US]) [A] 1,8,9* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0160526 | EP0322680 | EP0484890 | WO2005053308 |